Global Patent Index - EP 0766055 B1

EP 0766055 B1 2001-04-18 - Process and apparatus for the production of pressurized gas by cryogenic distillation

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the production of pressurized gas by cryogenic distillation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Druckgas durch kryogene Destillation

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de production d'un gaz sous pression par distillation cryogénique

Publication

EP 0766055 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402014 A

Priority

FR 9511474 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0766055A1] A process for pressurised gas prodn. in a cryogenic sepn. plant, involving (a) cooling the fluid to be separated in a heat exchanger (9) and feeding to a distillation column (12) of the plant and (b) withdrawing a liq. stream from a column (14) of the plant and reheating in the heat exchanger (9), includes the novel steps of (c) adding top-up liq. (pref. of the same compsn.) to the withdrawn liq. stream (pref. an oxygen-, nitrogen-, argon- or methane-rich liq.) of step (b); (d) reheating and opt. vaporising the resulting mixt. by indirect heat exchange in the heat exchanger (9); and (e) recovering gas under pressure at the plant outlet. Also claimed is a corresponding installation including an arrangement (27) for adding top-up liq. to the withdrawn liq. upstream of the heat exchanger (9) and an arrangement for passing the resulting mixt. to the exchanger (9) to form the pressurised gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04103 (2013.01); F25J 3/04254 (2013.01); F25J 3/0426 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04393 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04836 (2013.01); F25J 3/04957 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2210/50 (2013.01); F25J 2240/46 (2013.01); F25J 2245/50 (2013.01); Y10S 62/94 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

H. Linde, H. Hausen, "Tieftemperaturtechnik", Springer-Verlag, 1985, pages 322 et 323

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0766055 A1 19970402; EP 0766055 B1 20010418; AR 003711 A1 19980909; CA 2186837 A1 19970330; ES 2158262 T3 20010901; FR 2739439 A1 19970404; FR 2739439 B1 19971114; PL 316350 A1 19970401; US 5685173 A 19971111

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158262

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT NL

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990810

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971002

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT NL