Global Patent Index - EP 0766209 B1

EP 0766209 B1 2002-11-13 - Collecting and dispensing device for round data carriers, e.g. coin shaped transponders, to free a blocking device for persons or vehicles

Title (en)

Collecting and dispensing device for round data carriers, e.g. coin shaped transponders, to free a blocking device for persons or vehicles

Title (de)

Einnahme- und Ausgabevorrichtung für runde Datenträger, z.B. münzförmige Transponder, zur Freigabe einer Sperreinrichtung für Personen oder Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de collection et de distribution de supports de données ronds (p.ex. transpondeurs en forme de pièces de monnaie) pour débloquer un dispositif de blocage pour personnes ou véhicules

Publication

EP 0766209 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115376 A

Priority

EP 95115376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0766209A1] The dispensing device has a main shaft (4) for transporting the tokens under their own weight between a supply container (2) and a delivery point (6), with a side shaft for returned tokens communicating with the mnain shaft at a point above the delivery point. An ejection device allows tokens from either shaft to be diverted to a collection container (16), with a controlled blocking element (10) allowing the token in the main shaft to be held while variable data is recorded on it via a data recording device. The side shaft communicates with the main shaft at a point below the blocking element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/00; G07B 15/04; G07F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/00 (2006.01); G07B 15/04 (2006.01); G07F 1/06 (2006.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/14 (2006.01); G07F 17/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/00 (2013.01); G07B 15/04 (2013.01); G07F 1/06 (2013.01); G07F 17/145 (2013.01); G07F 17/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0766209 A1 19970402; EP 0766209 B1 20021113; AT 227870 T 20021115; DE 59510460 D1 20021219; ES 2185679 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59510460

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227870 T

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-05-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59510460

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH

- Free text: SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH#BREITE STRASSE 132#D-41238 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH#BREITE STRASSE 132#D-41238 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185679 T3

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510460 20021219

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227870 T 20021115

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991006

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960423

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE