Global Patent Index - EP 0766210 A3

EP 0766210 A3 2000-03-15 - Closure for teller machine

Title (en)

Closure for teller machine

Title (de)

Verschlussklappenanordnung für die Zugriffsöffnung an einem Bankautomaten

Title (fr)

Fermeture pour machine bancaire

Publication

EP 0766210 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96112531 A

Priority

DE 19536484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0766210A2] The cover has a part cylindrical flap (38) coupled via at least one lever (44) perpendicular to its pivot axis to a frame. The flap is rotated about the pivot axis via a reversible electric motor, with a cam element (56) mounted on its drive shaft cooperating with a cam follower (58) attached to the lever. The flap is spring biased into the closed position, with a closure hook (68) mounted on the drive shaft cooperating with a hook element (78) provided by the lever, to prevent forced opening of the flap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0766210 A2 19970402; EP 0766210 A3 20000315; EP 0766210 B1 20021120; DE 19536484 C1 19970403

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160801

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-08-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160801

2016-08-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609879

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609879 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE