Global Patent Index - EP 0766275 B1

EP 0766275 B1 2000-04-05 - Keypad

Title (en)

Keypad

Title (de)

Tastatur

Title (fr)

Clavier

Publication

EP 0766275 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95306877 A

Priority

EP 95306877 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0766275A1] An electronic keypad has an elastomeric key sheet (3) clamped between a bottom housing (1) and an apertured top cover (2), the exposed edge of the key sheet being formed as an enlarged bead (6) to act as a shock-absorber if the device is dropped or knocked. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0766275 A1 19970402; EP 0766275 B1 20000405; DE 69516142 D1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020917

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BRILLIANT CONCEPTS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2000-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516142 20000511

2000-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRILLIANT CONCEPTS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990423

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970920

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI