Global patent index - EP 0766348 B1

EP 0766348 B1 2000-01-19 - Connector

Title (en)

Connector

Title (de)

Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur

Publication

EP 0766348 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115395 A

Priority

EP 95115395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0766348A1] A plug connector comprises a plug with three flat longitudinal contact pins, a flat longitudinal protective contact pin and a central threaded bore. The unit has a conical section (11) which forms the housing, and an outer thread (121) on a hollow cylinder (12). A nut (5) is screwed on the hollow cylinder and the inner space is filled with a sealing element (4). A four core cable (3) passes through the nut and sealing element. A further unit (14) is located on the plug side of the housing and accommodates a seal (6). A contact unit (2) in the housing incorporates a bayonet connector. The housing pref. consists of a plastic esp. polyacrylic sulphone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H01R 13/625

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/502 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/621 (2006.01); H01R 13/625 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/625 (2013.01); H01R 13/5205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0766348 A1 19970402; EP 0766348 B1 20000119; CA 2184870 A1 19970330; CA 2184870 C 20000208; DE 59507652 D1 20000224; JP 2812922 B2 19981022; JP H09115598 A 19970502; US 5795173 A 19980818

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090929

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070929

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507652

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960720

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT