Global Patent Index - EP 0766551 B1

EP 0766551 B1 2003-06-25 - IMPROVED SAFETY URINAL

Title (en)

IMPROVED SAFETY URINAL

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES SICHERHEITSURINAL

Title (fr)

URINAL DE SECURITE PERFECTIONNE

Publication

EP 0766551 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96907547 A

Priority

  • FR 9600412 W
  • FR 9503504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629972A1] An autoclavable bed urinal (1) made of transparent or translucent plastic and provided with a backflow preventing device (5) that may be detached using a special sealing screw-thread assembly. The urinal is easy to clean and sterilise and is particularly characterised in that it has a quick emptying system arranged opposite the neck and comprising a hole (2) with a tube (3) extending therefrom and having various closure systems so that advantageously the backflow preventer need not be removed before emptying. Said urinal has a detachable or fixed handle provided using a special technique. The figure shows the male version.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 9/00; A61G 7/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629972 A1 19961003; AT 243490 T 20030715; CA 2189897 A1 19961003; CA 2189897 C 20050809; DE 69628795 D1 20030731; DE 69628795 T2 20040429; DK 0766551 T3 20031013; EP 0766551 A1 19970409; EP 0766551 B1 20030625; FR 2731900 A1 19960927; FR 2731900 B1 19970822

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 243490 T

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-05-04 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160318

2016-04-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160318

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-23 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160318

2016-03-21 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-03-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69628795

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ROBERT GOUGET

- Effective date: 20090623

2009-07-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090611 AND 20090617

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GOUGET JACQUES

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-02-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628795 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI NL SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000904

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961126

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI NL SE