Global patent index - EP 0766861 B1

EP 0766861 B1 2000-03-29 - A METHOD FOR SPEECH SYNTHESIS MODELLING, AND SPEECH SYNTHESIS APPARATUS

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR SPEECH SYNTHESIS MODELLING, AND SPEECH SYNTHESIS APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MODELIERUNG VON SPRACHSYNTHESE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MODELISATION DE SYNTHESE DE LA PAROLE ET APPAREIL DE SYNTHESE DE LA PAROLE

Publication

EP 0766861 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96905961 A

Priority

  • EP 96905961 A
  • EP 95201011 A
  • IB 9600237 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633487A2] Speech synthesis is based on a human vocal chords model with two dynamically interlinked masses. Their positions determine glottis parameters. In particular, a first sub-model describes the dynamically interlinked masses acted upon by external forces. A second dynamical partial model describes dynamics of a contour of the glottis in dependence of geometry parameters produced by the first sub-model, and outputs a first part of the external forces in addition to transmitting the geometry parameters. A third hydrodynamic sub-model describes hydrodynamics in dependence of the transmitted parameters, is acted upon by air pressure parameters, and outputs a second part of the external forces and an actual volume velocity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 13/04; G10L 101/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 11/00 (2006.01); G10L 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633487 A2 19961024; WO 9633487 A3 19961121; DE 69607434 D1 20000504; DE 69607434 T2 20000914; EP 0766861 A2 19970409; EP 0766861 B1 20000329; JP H10501902 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607434

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 13/04 A, 7G 10L 101/20 B

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990428

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB