Global Patent Index - EP 0767049 B1

EP 0767049 B1 2003-06-04 - A biaxially oriented polyester film for use in producing containers

Title (en)

A biaxially oriented polyester film for use in producing containers

Title (de)

Biaxial-orientierte Polyesterfolie zur Verwendung bei der Herstellung von Behältern

Title (fr)

Film en polyester étiré biaxialement utilisé dans la production de conteneurs

Publication

EP 0767049 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96307203 A

Priority

  • JP 25520795 A
  • JP 30011295 A
  • JP 6434596 A
  • JP 9388996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767049A2] A biaxially oriented polyester film for use in producing containers comprises (1) a polyester containing 93 mol% or more of ethylene terephthalate units as a component, having a breaking elongation in the machine direction (S MD) and a breaking elongation in the transverse direction (S TD) satisfying ÄFormula 1Ü and ÄFormula 2Ü, or (2) a polyester containing 93 mol% or more of ethylene terephthalate units as a component and having a face orientation coefficient of from 0.01 to less than 0.13, or (3) a polyester containing 95 mol% or more of ethylene terephthalate units as a component and having an amorphous Young's modulus of from 120 to 220 kg/mm<2>. Since the film has excellent formability, impact resistance and taste property, it is especially suitable as a film on both the inner and outer faces of metallic cans. <MATH> S MD: Breaking elongation in the machine direction S TD: Breaking elongation in the transverse direction <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 7/01; B32B 27/36; C08J 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 55/00 (2006.01); B32B 27/36 (2006.01); C08J 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/36 (2013.01); B29C 55/005 (2013.01); B32B 7/02 (2013.01); B32B 7/12 (2013.01); B32B 15/08 (2013.01); B32B 27/08 (2013.01); C08J 5/18 (2013.01); B29K 2067/00 (2013.01); B32B 2307/406 (2013.01); B32B 2307/518 (2013.01); C08J 2367/02 (2013.01); Y10S 428/91 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1355 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24942 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2495 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24959 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24967 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/269 (2013.01); Y10T 428/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2813 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2817 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31678 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31681 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767049 A2 19970409; EP 0767049 A3 19980204; EP 0767049 B1 20030604; CA 2186935 A1 19970403; CA 2186935 C 20050104; CN 1134334 C 20040114; CN 1158781 A 19970910; DE 69628522 D1 20030710; DE 69628522 T2 20040415; US 6610378 B1 20030826

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161001

2016-10-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69628522

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628522 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000207

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980525

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL