Global Patent Index - EP 0767064 B1

EP 0767064 B1 2001-05-16 - Device for monitoring the operation of an inkjet printinghead

Title (en)

Device for monitoring the operation of an inkjet printinghead

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Überwachung der Funktion eines Tintendruckkopfes

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance du fonctionnement d'une tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0767064 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250201 A

Priority

DE 19537161 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19537161C1] The system has a control circuit 5 that delivers command signals to the print head 1. The system has a sensor head 2 with at least two electrodes 21 that contact the printed surface of the paper 4. The electrical characteristics, e.g. conductivity, dielectric constant, vary dependent upon the nature of the deposited ink and is a measure of the condition of the ink jet head. The sensor is coupled to a processing circuit 3 that determines when a head cleaning cycle should be initiated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/195; B41J 2/12; B41J 2/125; B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/125 (2006.01); B41J 29/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/0451 (2013.01); B41J 2/04558 (2013.01); B41J 2/0458 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/125 (2013.01); B41J 29/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19537161 C1 19961219; EP 0767064 A2 19970409; EP 0767064 A3 19980916; EP 0767064 B1 20010516; US 5771051 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DIGITAL GRAPHICS INCORPORATION

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO.#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DIGITAL GRAPHICS INCORPORATION#517, DEOKE-DON YANGJU-SHI#KYUNGGI-DO, 482-050 (KR)

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606900 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI