Global Patent Index - EP 0767071 B1

EP 0767071 B1 2000-01-26 - Ink-jet recording sheet

Title (en)

Ink-jet recording sheet

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsblatt

Title (fr)

Feuille pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0767071 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96115970 A

Priority

JP 26019895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767071A1] An ink-jet recording sheet, having an excellent ink absorption and capable of forming images with high color density and sharpness, includes a substrate and an ink-receiving layer, formed on the substrate, which includes a pigment and a self-emulsifying, cationic acrylic copolymer resin having cationic groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B32B 27/20 (2006.01); B32B 27/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); D21H 19/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5245 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767071 A1 19970409; EP 0767071 B1 20000126; DE 69606369 D1 20000302; DE 69606369 T2 20000914; JP 3141753 B2 20010305; JP H0999633 A 19970415

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151004

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151004

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606369

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: SUGIYAMA, NAONOBU * OKUMURA, YOSHITAKA * KONDO, HIROMASA

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606369 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980604

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB