Global Patent Index - EP 0767120 B1

EP 0767120 B1 2000-12-27 - Sheet guiding device for sheet feeder

Title (en)

Sheet guiding device for sheet feeder

Title (de)

Bogenleiteinrichtung für Bogenanleger

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de feuilles pour margeur de feuilles

Publication

EP 0767120 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114923 A

Priority

DE 19537284 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19537284C1] The device has sheet guide elements (2), formed as a unit of band-shaped body (2a) and winding roller (2b) charged by a return winding force, for the band. The side facing the sheet-processing machine has holders (3) for the guide elements. At least those holders located within the format adjusting area are adjustable at right angles to the sheet conveying direction (7). The bands consist of a highly elastic material, and have a sheathing or coating of a material with a low friction coefficient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/66; B65H 3/08; B65H 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/68 (2006.01); B65H 5/36 (2006.01); B65H 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/68 (2013.01); B65H 3/0825 (2013.01); B65H 5/38 (2013.01); B65H 2404/6911 (2013.01); B65H 2511/12 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/12 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11 + B65H 2220/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19537284 C1 19961024; EP 0767120 A2 19970409; EP 0767120 A3 19971105; EP 0767120 B1 20001227; JP H09124181 A 19970513; US 5863037 A 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2004-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-01-08 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20020818

2002-10-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021001

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000306

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960918

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI