Global Patent Index - EP 0767124 B1

EP 0767124 B1 2001-05-09 - Pair of traction rollers

Title (en)

Pair of traction rollers

Title (de)

Zugwalzenpaar

Title (fr)

Paire de rouleaux de traction

Publication

EP 0767124 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115769 A

Priority

DE 19537422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767124A2] The distance (a) between the two rollers (2,3) can be altered. At least one of the rollers has a drive mechanism (21,22). The multilayered web of material (4) is fed between the rollers by transporter elements (13) the distance between which alters the peripheral speed of the transporter elements. Each transporter wheel is positioned to the right and left of a roll barrel (6) on roller studs (9,11). The wheels engage the paper and draw it forward.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/02; B65H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 2403/52 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1344 (2013.01); B65H 2404/14 (2013.01); B65H 2404/142 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1441 (2013.01); B65H 2404/171 (2013.01); B65H 2511/14 (2013.01); B65H 2511/224 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/14 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767124 A2 19970409; EP 0767124 A3 19971105; EP 0767124 B1 20010509; DE 19537422 A1 19970417; JP 3105457 B2 20001030; JP H09123394 A 19970513; US 5692441 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041002

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041002

2003-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606870 20010613

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI