Global Patent Index - EP 0767241 B1

EP 0767241 B1 2001-03-28 - Method for manufacturing metal cans for drinks

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing metal cans for drinks

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Blechdosen für Getränke

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une boîte métallique du type boîte-boisson

Publication

EP 0767241 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401988 A

Priority

FR 9511734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767241A1] Steel comprises 0-0.008, pref. 0-0.004 wt.% C, 0.10-0.50, pref. 0.10-0.30% Mn, 0-0.006, pref. 0-0.004% N, 0.01-0.07, pref. 0.01-0.05% Al, 0-0.15% P, 0-0.020% S, 0-0.020% Si, up to 0.08% of one or more of Cu, Ni and Cr, 0.005-0.020% Ti and 0.005-0.020% Nb, the sum of Ti and Nb exceeding 0.020%, the remainder being Fe and incidental impurities. Also claimed is making a cup-like drinks can blank from the steel, which is hot-rolled, then cold-rolled to make a sheet. The sheet is annealed and then pressed to form the can base with a peripheral flange. The flange is then drawn to form the can sidewall, at least part of the sidewall is annealed at above the recrystallisation temp. of the steel and finally the sidewall is further shaped to its final form. A can comprising a blank so made and fitted with a lid is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0447 (2013.01); C21D 8/0421 (2013.01); C21D 8/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767241 A1 19970409; EP 0767241 B1 20010328; DE 69612253 D1 20010503; DE 69612253 T2 20011018; ES 2156263 T3 20010616; FR 2739581 A1 19970411; FR 2739581 B1 19971031; NO 311666 B1 20020102; NO 964235 A 19970407; NO 964235 D0 19961004

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-09-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-09-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20030414

2003-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020907

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2002-02-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20011224

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-06-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156263 T3

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612253 20010503

2001-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE