Global patent index - EP 0767275 B1

EP 0767275 B1 2000-03-22 - Sound absorber for ballastless railway superstructure

Title (en)

Sound absorber for ballastless railway superstructure

Title (de)

Schallabsorber für einen schotterlosen Eisenbahnoberbau

Title (fr)

Absorbeur de bruit pour la superstructure d'une voie ferrée sans ballast

Publication

EP 0767275 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116035 A

Priority

DE 29515935 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767275A1] The absorber consists of two formed bodies with sound-absorbent characteristics, located between and next to the rails. The formed bodies (1) consist of a water-impermeable bearing concrete layer (9) and a sound-absorbent layer (10) above it. This consists of bonded macropore bulk material. A large number of vertical drainage passages (14) pass through one or both layers. The formed bodies are elastically borne on the ground plate (2). The elastic bearing can consists of strips (8) etc. of elastic synthetic material, located between formed bodies and plate, esp. of neoprene, or of felt. The sound-absorbent layer may have inclined cross channels in the top.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 2/00 (2006.01); E01B 19/00 (2006.01); G10K 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/008 (2013.01); E01B 1/002 (2013.01); E01B 2/00 (2013.01); E01B 19/003 (2013.01); G10K 11/16 (2013.01); E01B 2204/09 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29515935 U1 19951130; AT 191028 T 20000415; EP 0767275 A1 19970409; EP 0767275 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2004-10-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041028

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PHILIPP *HOLZMANN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *ASPHALT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021007

2001-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010913

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU NL

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191028

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU NL