Global Patent Index - EP 0767300 B1

EP 0767300 B1 2000-03-22 - Two stroke V-engine

Title (en)

Two stroke V-engine

Title (de)

Zweitakt V-Motor

Title (fr)

Moteur en V à deux temps

Publication

EP 0767300 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810631 A

Priority

CH 278395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767300A1] The engine has at least one unit, having two cylinders and two pistons, which are each located on connecting rod and act on a common crankshaft. The two cylinders (36,37) have a common scavenger crankcase chamber (40). The pistons (34,35) are located on the crankshaft (48) so that they execute a movement mainly in the same direction. The crankshaft is sealed in the crankcase to the outside, via two shaft seals (45) only. It has only two main crankshaft bearings and three crank webs. The engine unit has one intake (41) and two outlets (42,43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 25/14; F02B 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/14 (2006.01); F02B 25/28 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/14 (2013.01); F02B 25/28 (2013.01); F02B 61/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767300 A1 19970409; EP 0767300 B1 20000322; DE 59604747 D1 20000427; ES 2144719 T3 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020926

2001-10-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010907

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144719 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604747 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-02-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990218

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970510

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI