Global Patent Index - EP 0767308 B1

EP 0767308 B1 2000-03-01 - Side-channel compressor

Title (en)

Side-channel compressor

Title (de)

Seitenkanalverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à canal latéral

Publication

EP 0767308 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115234 A

Priority

DE 19537353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767308A1] The side channel compressor has at least one side channel (4) within the compressor housing (1) and a separator (7) between the suction and pressure sides. The compressor comprises boundary sides (8) extending radially relative to the side channel. The boundary sides of the separator include at least one heart-shaped section (9) over the full radial height. The peaks of the heart-shaped sections on the suction and pressure sides are aligned with one another. The opening angle of each peak is less than 25 degrees. Each heart-shaped section lies symmetrical to the axial centre (10) of the separator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 23/00; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 23/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 23/008 (2013.01); F04D 29/161 (2013.01); F04D 29/663 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767308 A1 19970409; EP 0767308 B1 20000301; JP 3243191 B2 20020107; JP H09112484 A 19970502; US 5672046 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100923

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990705

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970505

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT