Global patent index - EP 0767352 B1

EP 0767352 B1 2001-04-18 - Process and apparatus for the production of moderate purity oxygen

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the production of moderate purity oxygen

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Sauerstoff mässiger Reinheit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de production d'oxygène à pureté modérée

Publication

EP 0767352 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96307221 A

Priority

US 53854195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5592832A] The present invention relates to a cryogenic process and apparatus for production of an oxygen product from air, characterized in that a multiple passage plate-fin heat exchanger having at least two sets of passages is used to effectuate the rectifying and stripping functions, wherein one set of passages comprises a continuous-contact rectification dephlegmator which rectifies the separator vapor and produces the enriched-nitrogen rectifier overhead and the crude liquid oxygen bottoms; wherein a second set of passages comprises a continuous-contact stripping dephlegmator which strips the oxygen-enriched liquid to produce the nitrogen-enriched stripper overhead and the oxygen product; wherein reflux of the rectification device and boilup for the stripping device is provided, at least in part, by indirect heat exchange between and along said two sets of passages, thereby producing a thermal link between the rectification dephlegmator and the stripping dephlegmator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/06; F25J 3/00; F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04872 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04206 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/0463 (2013.01); F25J 5/007 (2013.01); F25J 2200/04 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2205/04 (2013.01); F25J 2215/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/40 (2013.01); F25J 2250/50 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01); Y10S 62/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5592832 A 19970114; CA 2186550 A1 19970404; CA 2186550 C 19991102; CN 1129767 C 20031203; CN 1160181 A 19970924; DE 69612532 D1 20010523; DE 69612532 T2 20010823; DE 69612532 T3 20050127; EP 0767352 A2 19970409; EP 0767352 A3 19971001; EP 0767352 B1 20010418; EP 0767352 B2 20040728; JP 2833594 B2 19981209; JP H09170875 A 19970630; KR 100228590 B1 19991101; TW 297089 B 19970201

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-04 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2004-12-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2004-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-09-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20011003

2004-07-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-03-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612532

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990811

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971205

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL