Global Patent Index - EP 0767354 B1

EP 0767354 B1 2001-12-05 - Heat exchanger, more particularly supercharge air cooler for automotive vehicle

Title (en)

Heat exchanger, more particularly supercharge air cooler for automotive vehicle

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher, insbesondere Ladeluftkühler für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier radiateur d'air de suralimentation pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0767354 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96115937 A

Priority

FR 9511818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767354A1] The heat exchanger has a collector plate (10) with a wall. The wall has apertures (18) to receive the ends of the heat exchanger tubes. The wall is shaped to form collets (24) surrounding the apertures, to which the tubes are brazed. The wall is made with thin sections (A) in a selected region (28) surrounding each collet. This allows axial movement of the collet relative to the rest of the plate under the effect of variations in tube length as a result of thermal expansion fluctuations. The thin sections of the wall follow the shape of the collets. Each collet is connected to the rest of the plate by an annular fold (26) with a U-shaped cross-section, having one side which forms the collet and the other the connecting pipe. The collector plate and the tubes are both made from aluminium. The thin sections are made by moulding or removing material from one or both sides of the plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/18 (2013.01); Y10S 165/051 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767354 A1 19970409; EP 0767354 B1 20011205; DE 69617598 D1 20020117; DE 69617598 T2 20020801; FR 2739680 A1 19970411; FR 2739680 B1 19971205; US 5676200 A 19971014

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617598

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617598 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990421

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970922

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE