Global patent index - EP 0767355 B1

EP 0767355 B1 2000-04-05 - Flechette-type sub-calibre projectile for practice, using kinetic energy

Title (en)

Flechette-type sub-calibre projectile for practice, using kinetic energy

Title (de)

Unterkalibriges Flechette-Übungsgeschoss vom kinetischen Energietyp

Title (fr)

Projectile d'exercice sous-calibré à énergie cinétique du type flèche

Publication

EP 0767355 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402050 A

Priority

FR 9511699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767355A1] The projectile consists of a penetrator (1) and a tail fin assembly (2). They are joined by a mechanical coupling (6,7) designed to separate after a predetermined flight duration. This causes the tail fin assembly to rotate relative to the penetrator by the aerodynamic forces acting on it. The mechanical separator is formed by two engaging fine-pitch threaded surfaces on the coupling components (6,7). For e.g. a 105 mm calibre projecting, the thread pitch is of the order of 0.25 - 1 mm for a length of about 50 mm. After a given flight duration the tail fin assembly unscrews from the penetrator, which drops rapidly to the ground.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/14; F42B 10/12; F42B 10/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/14 (2006.01); F42B 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/06 (2013.01); F42B 8/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767355 A1 19970409; EP 0767355 B1 20000405; DE 69607554 D1 20000511; DE 69607554 T2 20000907; FR 2739683 A1 19970411; FR 2739683 B1 19971205; US 5798479 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-09-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607554

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990615

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961009

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB