Global Patent Index - EP 0767411 B1

EP 0767411 B1 2001-03-21 - Electrophotographic photoconductor for use with liquid toners

Title (en)

Electrophotographic photoconductor for use with liquid toners

Title (de)

Elektrophotographisches photoleitfähiges Element geeignet für Flüssigentwicklung

Title (fr)

Photoconducteur électrophotographique utilisable avec des révélateurs liquides

Publication

EP 0767411 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306948 A

Priority

US 54012295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0767411A1] A photoconductor for use in electrophotographic reproduction devices is disclosed. This photoconductor exhibits excellent cycling stability and minimized charge transport molecule leaching when used with liquid toners. Further, the photoconductor has a relatively high glass transition temperature. The photoconductors of the present invention utilize, as the binder in the charge transport layer, a specifically defined bisphenol A/bisphenol TMC polycarbonate copolymer which has a bisphenol A: bisphenol TMC weight ratio of from about 30:70 to about 70:30, preferably from about 35:65 to about 65:35, and a polymer molecular weight of from about 10,000 to about 100,000, preferably from about 20,000 to about 50,000.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 64/00 (2006.01); C08G 64/04 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08L 69/00 (2006.01); G03G 5/05 (2006.01); G03G 5/06 (2006.01); G03G 9/12 (2006.01); G03G 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/0672 (2013.01); G03G 5/0564 (2013.01); G03G 5/0614 (2013.01); G03G 5/0616 (2013.01); G03G 5/0631 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0767411 A1 19970409; EP 0767411 B1 20010321; DE 69612160 D1 20010426; JP H09171263 A 19970630

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070924

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070924

2006-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-06-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612160

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990114

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970920

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT