Global patent index - EP 0767750 B1

EP 0767750 B1 2000-08-16 - A METHOD OF MANIPULATING A CONNECTING ELEMENT IN SHIPPING

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MANIPULATING A CONNECTING ELEMENT IN SHIPPING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MANIPULIEREN EINES VERBINDUNGSELEMENTES IN DER SCHIFFFAHRT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION D'UN ELEMENT DE RACCORDEMENT POUR LA NAVIGATION

Publication

EP 0767750 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95904041 A

Priority

  • NL 9500002 W
  • NL 9302289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9518038A1] A method of manipulating a connecting element in shipping, in which at least a free end of at least one connecting element is moved between an object to be called tug, such as a tugboat or a mooring installation, and an object to be towed, to be called tow, such as a seagoing vessel or an offshore installation, and is fastened to the tow or unfastened therefrom. The connecting element is gripped from the tug with a manipulator and is manipulated in such a manner that at least the movement of the free end between the tug and the tow is manipulator controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/00; B63B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/00 (2006.01); B63B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/04 (2013.01); B63B 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9518038 A1 19950706; AU 1284595 A 19950717; DE 69518422 D1 20000921; EP 0767750 A1 19970416; EP 0767750 B1 20000816; NL 9302289 A 19950717; NO 962777 A 19960828; NO 962777 D0 19960701

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2003-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-11-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518422

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL SE

2000-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980319

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960729

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL SE