Global Patent Index - EP 0767792 A4

EP 0767792 A4 2002-11-20 - VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

VITRONECTIN-REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE LA VITRONECTINE

Publication

EP 0767792 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95926152 A

Priority

  • US 9508306 W
  • US 26769594 A
  • US 42893395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9600730A1] Compounds are disclosed which are vitronectin receptor antagonists useful in the treatment of osteoporosis. These compounds comprise a fibrinogen receptor antagonist template linked to a heterocyclic moiety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 519/00; C07D 403/12; C07D 473/04; C07D 487/04; C07D 491/04; C07D 491/044; C07D 491/048; C07D 491/052; C07D 495/04; C07D 497/04; C07D 498/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 223/16 (2006.01); C07D 233/56 (2006.01); C07D 233/64 (2006.01); C07D 235/14 (2006.01); C07D 235/20 (2006.01); C07D 243/14 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/14 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/056 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 223/16 (2013.01); C07D 235/14 (2013.01); C07D 243/14 (2013.01); C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 403/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 491/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0385850 A2 19900905 - UNION PHARMA SCIENT APPL [FR]
  • [A] EP 0468470 A1 19920129 - THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]
  • [PA] WO 9415608 A1 19940721 - AGOURON PHARMA [US], et al
  • [A] FELDING-HABERMANN B ET AL: "VITRONECTIN AND ITS RECEPTORS", CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, vol. 5, 1993, pages 864 - 868, XP000885406, ISSN: 0955-0674
  • [X] PASCAL, ROBERT A., JR. ET AL: "Reactions of 2-dichloromethylbenzimidazole with certain primary amines", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. ( 1978 ), 15(1), 141-4, XP001094591
  • See also references of WO 9600730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9600730 A1 19960111; AU 3001095 A 19960125; AU 702661 B2 19990225; BR 9508178 A 19971118; CA 2193966 A1 19960111; CN 1156995 A 19970813; CZ 9603824 A3 19971217; EP 0767792 A1 19970416; EP 0767792 A4 20021120; HU 9603525 D0 19970228; HU T76344 A 19970828; JP H10504808 A 19980512; MX 9700041 A 19970430; NO 965608 A 19970227; NO 965608 D0 19961227; NZ 290008 A 19980826; NZ 329656 A 20000128; NZ 329822 A 20000228; PL 318199 A1 19970526

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1012358

2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 519/00 A, 7C 07D 498/04 B, 7C 07D 497/04 B, 7C 07D 495/04 B, 7C 07D 491/04 B, 7C 07D 491/044 B, 7C 07D 491/048 B, 7C 07D 491/052 B, 7C 07D 487/04 B, 7C 07D 473/04 B, 7C 07D 403/12 B

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961220

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 961220