Global Patent Index - EP 0767800 B1

EP 0767800 B1 2001-03-28 - HISTIDINE AND HOMOHISTIDINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN FARNESYLTRANSFERASE

Title (en)

HISTIDINE AND HOMOHISTIDINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN FARNESYLTRANSFERASE

Title (de)

HISTIDINE UND HOMOHISTIDINE DERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PROTEIN FARNESYLTRANSFERASE HEMMSTOFFE

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'HISTIDINE ET D'HOMOHISTIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE FARNESYLTRANSFERASE DE PROTEINES

Publication

EP 0767800 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95921421 A

Priority

  • US 9506660 W
  • US 26836494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9600736A1] Novel inhibitors of protein farnesyltransferase enzyme are described, as well as methods for the preparation and pharmaceutical compositions of the same, which are useful in controlling tissue proliferative diseases, including cancer and restenosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/078; A61K 31/415; A61K 38/05; A61K 38/06; A61P 35/00; C07D 233/64; C07K 5/097

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 233/54 (2006.01); C07D 233/64 (2006.01); C07K 1/02 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01); C07K 5/097 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/64 (2013.01); C07K 5/06139 (2013.01); C07K 5/06147 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9600736 A1 19960111; AT 200085 T 20010415; AU 2650495 A 19960125; AU 699629 B2 19981210; CA 2190977 A1 19960111; DE 69520499 D1 20010503; DE 69520499 T2 20010726; DK 0767800 T3 20010618; EP 0767800 A1 19970416; EP 0767800 B1 20010328; ES 2158115 T3 20010901; GR 3035936 T3 20010831; HR P950337 A2 19970831; HR P950337 B1 20011231; JP H10502078 A 19980224; MX 9605945 A 19971231; NO 315427 B1 20030901; NO 965604 A 19970225; NO 965604 D0 19961227; NZ 287696 A 19971219; PT 767800 E 20010830; US 5571792 A 19961105; ZA 9505411 B 19960205

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061205

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WARNER-LAMBERT CY

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060530

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-06-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050603

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-06 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-14 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040530

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158115 T3

2001-06-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520499 20010503

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19961219;LV PAYMENT 19961219;SI PAYMENT 19961219

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200085 T 20010415

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 5/078 A, 7C 07K 5/097 B, 7C 07D 233/64 B, 7A 61K 38/05 B, 7A 61K 38/06 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 5/078 A, 7C 07K 5/097 B, 7C 07D 233/64 B, 7A 61K 38/05 B, 7A 61K 38/06 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990602

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961219

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 961219;LV PAYMENT 961219;SI PAYMENT 961219