Global patent index - EP 0767888 B1

EP 0767888 B1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR HEATING WATER FOR DOMESTIC USE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HEATING WATER FOR DOMESTIC USE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERWÄRMEN VON BRAUCHWASSER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE D'EAU SANITAIRE

Publication

EP 0767888 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95901259 A

Priority

  • AT 9400176 W
  • AT 238493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514894A1] A device for heating water for domestic use has a water reservoir (1) and a heat exchanger (2) arranged in the water reservoir (1). The heat exchanger (2) has at least one coiled pipe (5) with several coils for a heating medium. The coils of the coiled pipe (5) lie in a surface that extends above the bottom (4) of the water reservoir (1). In order to ensure advantageous heating conditions, the coils (6) of the coiled pipe (5), that preferably form a spiral and are distributed at least practically over the whole bottom surface, are arranged in a single layer in the vertical direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/20; F24D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24H 1/20 (2006.01); F28D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/082 (2013.01); F24H 1/208 (2013.01); F28D 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514894 A1 19950601; AT 406300 B 20000327; AT A238493 A 19990815; DE 59409718 D1 20010510; EP 0767888 A1 19970416; EP 0767888 B1 20010404; EP 0767888 B2 20040102; ES 2155881 T3 20010601; ES 2155881 T5 20040916

INPADOC legal status

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121124

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59409718

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121124

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: PATENTANWALTSBUERO STEUDTNER;AHORNWEG 6;5702 NIEDERLENZ (CH)

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-04-30 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: PATENTANWALTSBUREAU STEUDTNER;AHORNWEG 12;5702 NIEDERLENZ (CH)

2004-10-29 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2004-09-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2004-01-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-01-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VAILLANT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011102

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VAILLANT GMBH

- Effective date: 20011102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155881

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409718

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. W. STEUDTNER

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990525

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951120

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI