Global Patent Index - EP 0768101 B1

EP 0768101 B1 2001-05-16 - Hits detection and signalisation means for fencing sport

Title (en)

Hits detection and signalisation means for fencing sport

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Detektieren und Anzeigen von Treffern beim Sportfechten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection et de signalisation de touches en escrime

Publication

EP 0768101 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440084 A

Priority

FR 9512189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768101A1] The two combatants fence on a conducting surface (4). Each combatant wears both a touch detector (1,1'), electrically connected to their sword (2), and a unit (3), which evaluates and signals a valid touch, connected to the conducting surface (4). Each combatant wears footwear (5) with conducting soles, which ensure a good electrical connection between the conducting surface (4) and the detectors (1,1'), or conducting targets (6) attached to each combatant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 69/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/02 (2013.01); A63B 2069/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768101 A1 19970416; EP 0768101 B1 20010516; DE 69612809 D1 20010621; DE 69612809 T2 20011122; ES 2159004 T3 20010916; FR 2739787 A1 19970418; FR 2739787 B1 19980109; US 5836853 A 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031013

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031011

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031011

2002-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159004 T3

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612809 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000404

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970929

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT