Global Patent Index - EP 0768126 B1

EP 0768126 B1 2001-05-30 - Method and device for minimizing the height of wire bundles

Title (en)

Method and device for minimizing the height of wire bundles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Minimierung der Höhe von Drahtbunden

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour minimiser la hauteur de bobines de fil

Publication

EP 0768126 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115797 A

Priority

DE 19538299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768126A1] The process minimises the height of a wire bundle (2) which is formed in a chamber (3) from a sequence of wire coils. The individual coils are first transferred from a roughly horizontal transportation direction, into an intake housing (4), and are then brought into a roughly vertical fall direction, prior to transfer to the chamber. The coils are subjected to an additional horizontal centrifugal motion during the fall motion, and the centrifugal force may be transmitted at least partially to the individual coils. The extent of the centrifugal motions which are exerted on the coils, may also have inner and outer limits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/82 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01); B65H 55/00 (2006.01); B65H 57/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768126 A1 19970416; EP 0768126 B1 20010530; AT 201618 T 20010615; CN 1085952 C 20020605; CN 1153686 A 19970709; DE 19538299 A1 19970417; JP H09192735 A 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041002

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041003

2004-10-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041002

2004-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041002

2003-10-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031010

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-01 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606992 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201618 T 20010615

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961017

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE