Global patent index - EP 0768127 B1

EP 0768127 B1 2000-07-12 - Drawing apparatus for a press

Title (en)

Drawing apparatus for a press

Title (de)

Ziehvorrichtung für eine Presse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étirage pour une presse

Publication

EP 0768127 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116085 A

Priority

DE 19538316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768127A2] The device has a piston rod (5) to retain a metal sheet in a holder, which can be accelerated before the application of a drawing element. An accelerating cylinder (5) is fixed to the press, and has an accelerating piston which combines with the rod, and which has a larger first pressure surface which opposes the drawing direction, than its opposing second pressure surface. The corresponding first and second pressure spaces (7,8) in the cylinder around the accelerating piston can be connected to a pressure reservoir (11), and the first pressure space can also be connected to a dosing cylinder (15), in which a dosing piston (16) is guided. A forward stroke cylinder (17) is fixed to the press parallel to the retaining piston rod, and has a forward stroke piston rod (18) and a piston (19), which is separated from it by a controlled first pressure volume (20). A second pressure volume (21) can also be displaced by this piston.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 24/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 24/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768127 A2 19970416; EP 0768127 A3 19970423; EP 0768127 B1 20000712; CZ 290543 B6 20020814; CZ 9602989 A3 19970416; DE 19538316 A1 19970417; ES 2149413 T3 20001101; US 5746084 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031009

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-10-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149413

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991221

1999-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971017

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE