Global patent index - EP 0768174 B1

EP 0768174 B1 2000-01-19 - Method and device for connecting a cylinder

Title (en)

Method and device for connecting a cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ankuppeln eines Zylinders

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour accoupler un cylindre

Publication

EP 0768174 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115767 A

Priority

DE 19537421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768174A1] The first coupling plate (6) by means of a work cylinder (19) fed with pressure medium is axially displaceable relatively to the second coupling plate (4). The first coupling plate is provided with a control valve (36). This control valve is so operable by the second coupling plate that during a coupling process it feeds pressure medium out of the work cylinder and the control valve is closed in a coupled state. The pressure (p1) during the coupling process amounts to a third to two thirds of the final pressure (p2), i.e. p1 = 1/3 to 2/3 p2. A pressure switch measures the ruling pressure (p1, p2) in the work cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); F16D 11/10 (2006.01); F16D 25/063 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19537421 C1 19970327; EP 0768174 A1 19970416; EP 0768174 B1 20000119; JP 2849073 B2 19990120; JP H09131852 A 19970520; US 5701818 A 19971230

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604218

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041002

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041003

2004-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041002

2003-10-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604218

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990125

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971004

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE