Global Patent Index - EP 0768188 B1

EP 0768188 B1 2000-06-28 - Booklet of individually detachable sheets, method of manufacturing, kit and stand

Title (en)

Booklet of individually detachable sheets, method of manufacturing, kit and stand

Title (de)

Heft mit einzeln herauslösbaren Blättern, Herstellungsverfahren, Set und Halterung

Title (fr)

Liasse de feuilles individuellement détachables, procédé de fabrication, kit et présentoir

Publication

EP 0768188 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96430013 A

Priority

FR 9512410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768188A1] The holder/dispenser is designed to hold a block of sheets of the same size, attached by their upper edges to an adhesive strip (8). The sheets are of waxed paper or a thermo-sealable material, and are attached to the strip, which is of card, by a coating of a hot melt adhesive 0.03 to 0.5 mm thick and with a melting point of 60 - 85 deg C, measured by the ball and ring test. The card strip (8) has a flap (9) hinged to at least one of its edges, by which it can be suspended from a hook. The holder/dispenser can also incorporate a rear support, made from cut and folded card, which supports the lower ends of the suspended sheets, e.g. with their edges turned up for easy removal of the top sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/003 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768188 A1 19970416; EP 0768188 B1 20000628; DE 69609033 D1 20000803; FR 2739806 A1 19970418; FR 2739806 B1 19980313

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2006-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060809

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-09-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609033 20000803

2000-07-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BOOKLET OF INDIVIDUALLY DETACHABLE SHEETS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING, KIT AND STAND

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981019

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970927

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI SE