Global Patent Index - EP 0768189 B1

EP 0768189 B1 2000-05-10 - Method for realising documents with security marks in the form of foil elements and document with those security elements

Title (en)

Method for realising documents with security marks in the form of foil elements and document with those security elements

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dokumenten mit einem Sicherheitsmerkmal in Form eines Folienelements und Dokument mit einem solchen Sicherheitsmerkmal

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réaliser des documents avec des éléments de sécurité sous forme de feuilles et document avec un tel élément de sécurité

Publication

EP 0768189 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810653 A

Priority

CH 288695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768189A1] The security document (W1), with a security film section (2) has a machine-readable variable print (3a,4a) applied to the film before it is bonded durably to the document. After the film is fitted, it is passed through a scanner which reads the information and controls a printer to reproduce the variable printed matter at another section of the document. The variable information on the film is preferably a letter or figure series. The printer is preferably a non-impact type such as an ink jet printer, to reproduce the serial number in the same or different scale.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.01); G03G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 25/328 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768189 A1 19970416; EP 0768189 B1 20000510; AT 192703 T 20000515; AU 6561696 A 19970417; AU 707985 B2 19990722; CA 2185206 A1 19970413; CA 2185206 C 20070717; CH 694636 A5 20050513; CN 1078545 C 20020130; CN 1157219 A 19970820; DE 59605173 D1 20000615; JP 3943169 B2 20070711; JP H09202078 A 19970805; KR 100402330 B1 20040131; RU 2183564 C2 20020620; US 5816619 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-30 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2005-03-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-03-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20040928

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192703

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990914

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970911

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE