Global patent index - EP 0768227 B1

EP 0768227 B1 2000-01-05 - Vehicle underframe with a pressure plate for a coupling

Title (en)

Vehicle underframe with a pressure plate for a coupling

Title (de)

Wagenunterbau mit einer Druckplatte für eine Wagenkupplung

Title (fr)

Chassis d'un véhicule avec une plaque de compression pour un attelage

Publication

EP 0768227 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810638 A

Priority

CH 289095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768227A1] The substructure of a railway or tram rolling stock has a pressure plate (14) for a coupling fitted to the chassis (10). The pressure plate is fitted into a groove (16) worked into a central chassis profile, across the longitudinal line (x) of the rolling stock. It is fixed and supported by an inner support profile (18) at the chassis profile, along the rolling stock line, to lie against the back wall (15) of the pressure plate with its end side. The support profile has a U-shaped cross-section, supported at the other end by a crossmember (12). It is held in place by thickened welded strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60D 1/52 (2006.01); B61F 1/10 (2006.01); B61F 1/14 (2006.01); B62D 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768227 A1 19970416; EP 0768227 B1 20000105; AT 188423 T 20000115; CH 691461 A5 20010731; CZ 290542 B6 20020814; CZ 9602921 A3 19970416; DE 59604100 D1 20000210; ES 2142039 T3 20000401

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050927

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010927

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-10-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001002

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-09-20 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20000920

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000919

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000821

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142039

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604100

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000106

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188423

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971016

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI