Global Patent Index - EP 0768258 B1

EP 0768258 B1 2001-12-12 - Discontinuously working winding machine for winding material

Title (en)

Discontinuously working winding machine for winding material

Title (de)

Diskontinuierlich wirkende Spulmaschine zum Aufwickeln von Spulgut

Title (fr)

Machine de bobinage à fonctionnement discontinu pour enrouler du matériau à bobiner

Publication

EP 0768258 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116022 A

Priority

DE 19538095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768258A2] The equipment for discontinuous winding of strip material (13), and especially an adhesive ribbon strip, has two winding spindles (10,11) which are driven alternately, rotating freely on a swing drum (4). They act alternately as a winding spindle, in one position, and as a reserve spindle in the other position. A cutter (21) severs the strip material when the assembly is at rest. The equipment has a unit (25) to tense the strip material during cutting and laying. The tensing unit has a spring to give the strip stretching action. A control acts on a brake system to act on the spindles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2215 (2013.01); B65H 2408/23152 (2013.01); B65H 2701/377 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768258 A2 19970416; EP 0768258 A3 19971022; EP 0768258 B1 20011212; AT 210589 T 20011215; DE 19538095 A1 19970417; DE 19538095 C2 19990729; JP H09110246 A 19970428; KR 100437950 B1 20040825; TW 318173 B 19971021; US 5775628 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071007

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061007

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061007

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061007

2005-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608426 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210589 T 20011215

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI