Global Patent Index - EP 0768271 B1

EP 0768271 B1 2000-02-09 - Winding apparatus for a continuously running thread

Title (en)

Winding apparatus for a continuously running thread

Title (de)

Spulmaschine für einen kontinuierlich auflaufenden Faden

Title (fr)

Bobinoir pour un fil en déplacement continu

Publication

EP 0768271 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116021 A

Priority

DE 19538480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768271A2] A winding machine for a continuously accumulating thread (1) has a rotatable drum (6) on which are mounted two reel spindles which can be rotated. Ahead of the drum as the thread runs, the machine also has a thread laying device (4) and a roller (5) which makes contact on its periphery with the reel (15) being formed on the operating spindle (9 or 10). The distance between the roller axis (13) and the operating spindle axis (11) can be changed in an expanding direction corresp. to the increasing reel dia. The machine has a drum rotation controller (20), a device for determining thread speed and a device for determining the rotational speed of the operating spindle. The controller has a computer unit (21) for calculating the present instantaneous dia. of the reel under formation and its present instantaneous angular speed between beginning and end of each computing cycle for use as control quantities for the drum rotation over the complete reel travel. Also claimed is a process for control of the winding machine using the above appts. where the drum is rotated with angular speed which varies continuously from one computing cycle to the next.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/048; B65H 54/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/52 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/52 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2511/212 (2013.01); B65H 2557/24 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768271 A2 19970416; EP 0768271 A3 19980121; EP 0768271 B1 20000209; AT 189666 T 20000215; DE 19538480 C1 19970507; DE 19538480 C2 20011025; JP 3523429 B2 20040426; JP H09169469 A 19970630; TW 316892 B 19971001; US 5785265 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041007

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-10-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041007

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Free Format Text: ERRATUM: THE FOLLOWING EUROPEAN PATENTS WERE ADVERTISED IN ERROR IN JOURNAL 5781 DATED 1 MARCH 2000 AS HAVING BEEN FILED UNDER SECTION 77(6)(A) ON 8 FEBRUARY 2000.

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604407

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189666

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980807

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980129

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI