Global Patent Index - EP 0768396 B1

EP 0768396 B1 2001-12-12 - A device for removing vegetable matter in a wool card

Title (en)

A device for removing vegetable matter in a wool card

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen von pflanzlichen Verunreinigungen in einer Krempel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever des matériaux végétaux dans une carde dite "carde laine"

Publication

EP 0768396 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96115913 A

Priority

IT TO950814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768396A1] A device for removing vegetable matter in a wool card including at least two Morel rollers (2; 9) with each of which there cooperates at least one burr-beater (3, 6; 10, 13). The wool is conveyed from a first Morel roller (2) to the next Morel roller (9) by means of a pair of rollers (7, 8) including a brush roller (7) having a peripheral speed greater than that of the first Morel roller (2) and a reverser roller (8) having a rigid cover with triangular points facing in the sense of rotation which has a peripheral speed less than that of the brush roller (7) and which totally doffs the brush roller (7) by condensation whereby the said next Morel roller (9) turns at a peripheral speed substantially equal to that of the first Morel roller (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/98 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/98 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

B.V. HARROWFIELD: "Early-stage worsted processing", WOOL SCIENCE REVIEW, no. 64, December 1987 (1987-12-01), IWS ILKLEY, pages 45 - 46

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768396 A1 19970416; EP 0768396 B1 20011212; DE 69617864 D1 20020124; DE 69617864 T2 20020711; ES 2164817 T3 20020301; IT 1280964 B1 19980211; IT TO950814 A1 19970410; IT TO950814 D0 19951010

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FOR ING. GRAZIANO S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041005

2005-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041004

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FOR ING. GRAZIANO S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041004

2003-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164817 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617864 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: F.O.R. ING. GRAZIANO S.P.A.

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FONDERIE OFFICINE RIUNITE F.O.R. ING. GRAZIANO DI

1997-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BACCHIO, GIOVANNI

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT