Global Patent Index - EP 0768402 B1

EP 0768402 B1 2000-04-12 - Device for programming rotary dobbies in weaving machines

Title (en)

Device for programming rotary dobbies in weaving machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Programmieren von Rotationsschaftmaschinen im Webstühlen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour programmer les ratières rotatives dans les métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 0768402 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96115972 A

Priority

IT MI952037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768402A1] Device for programming rotary dobbies to operate the heald frames in weaving machines, said dobbies being of the type wherein the rods (3) to control the heald frames are operated by connecting rods (2), each mounted onto an eccentric ring (5) rotating in respect of the main dobby shaft (1), the dobby also including a disk (13) caused to rotate by said shaft (1) and a selection lever (7) pivoted on said eccentric ring (5) and apt to engage said disk (13) with a tooth end (11) thereof, under the action of a spring (12). The device comprises a control lever (14) having projecting end profiles (14A, 14B) for controlling said selection lever (7), wherein one of the projecting end profiles is formed with a tooth (14B), pivoted into a slot having two divergent abutting walls (14X, 14Y), and kept in contact with one of said walls (14X) by a spring (14D) so as to be able to oscillate up to contacting the other wall (14Y), in order to shift the positive engagement with said selection lever (7) in the condition of reverse movement of the dobby. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768402 A1 19970416; EP 0768402 B1 20000412; DE 69607716 D1 20000518; DE 69607716 T2 20000921; IT 1276827 B1 19971103; IT MI952037 A1 19970407; IT MI952037 D0 19951006

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151004

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607716

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131004

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607716 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970516

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI