Global patent index - EP 0768412 B1

EP 0768412 B1 2000-05-31 - Thread control device for flat bed knitting machines

Title (en)

Thread control device for flat bed knitting machines

Title (de)

Fadenkontrollvorrichtung für Flachstrickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de fil pour métiers à tricoter rectilignes

Publication

EP 0768412 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114103 A

Priority

DE 19538312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768412A1] A thread control appts. for flat knitting machines has a case on which are located a thread brake, a knot monitor and a thread break sensor. A slide (18), which moves in a recess (17) in the case, regulates the thread brake and its base (18.1) slides along a spring piece (19) mounted at one end so the other free end of the piece alters the force which a spring (20) applies to the brake w.r.t. the slide position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/44; D04B 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/10 (2006.01); B65H 63/028 (2006.01); B65H 63/032 (2006.01); D04B 15/44 (2006.01); D04B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/14 (2013.01); D04B 15/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768412 A1 19970416; EP 0768412 B1 20000531; DE 19538312 A1 19970417; DE 19538312 B4 20040902; ES 2146821 T3 20000816; JP 2787675 B2 19980820; JP H09170149 A 19970630; US 5752396 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050904

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030905

2002-10-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000915

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146821

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991116

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971004

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT