Global Patent Index - EP 0768413 B1

EP 0768413 B1 2000-04-12 - Thread furnishing device for textile machines

Title (en)

Thread furnishing device for textile machines

Title (de)

Fadenliefervorrichtung für Textilmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en fil pour machines textiles

Publication

EP 0768413 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115601 A

Priority

DE 19538135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768413A1] A yarn feed for textile machines has a vertical driven yarn storage drum (13) with an upper yarn entry region (26) in the form of a flat truncated cone and a lower storage region (29) which is cylindrical with a lower edge (36) without a bead. A yarn (21) is guided (24) tangentially to the entry region (26) and removed tangentially from the storage region (29) by a yarn guide (28). The vertical distance of the yarn guide (28) from the lower edge (36) corresponds to the distance between the yarn entry (33) and yarn exit (34) on the cylindrical storage region (29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768413 A1 19970416; EP 0768413 B1 20000412; DE 19538135 A1 19970417; JP H09188948 A 19970722; TW 330951 B 19980501; US 5820047 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604945 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990920

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TERROT STRICKMASCHINEN GMBH

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT