Global Patent Index - EP 0768414 B1

EP 0768414 B1 2000-05-31 - Thread guiding elements for thread guiding arm

Title (en)

Thread guiding elements for thread guiding arm

Title (de)

Fadenführerarm mit Fadenleitorganen

Title (fr)

Eléments guides-fils pour bras de guide-fil

Publication

EP 0768414 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114102 A

Priority

DE 19538280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768414A2] A yarn guide arm has yarn guide devices which are located on a yarn holding plate (10) without gap formation. The yarn guide devices (11,12,13) take the form of eyes (16) and are to be inserted into a mounting body (14) located on the plate. The devices (11,12,13) can be replaced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/06 (2006.01); D04B 15/54 (2006.01); D04B 15/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768414 A2 19970416; EP 0768414 A3 19980812; EP 0768414 B1 20000531; DE 19538280 A1 19970417; DE 19538280 C2 20030403; ES 2146820 T3 20000816; JP H09142734 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070904

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-08-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000915

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146820

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991116

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981218

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT