Global Patent Index - EP 0768424 B1

EP 0768424 B1 2000-06-14 - Heated roll

Title (en)

Heated roll

Title (de)

Heizwalze

Title (fr)

Cylindre chauffant

Publication

EP 0768424 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115816 A

Priority

DE 19538236 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768424A2] A steam-heated roller has pref. peripheral machined holes (4) at least approximately parallel to the roller axis for heat supply and removal, and discharge tubes or drilled holes (7) running from the machined holes radially towards the roller centre for condensate drainage. The radial tubes etc. are designed so that they cause mixing or spinning of steam and condensate. Also claimed is a process for control of the steam throughput and the condensate discharge using the above roller. The pressure difference between steam inlet and outlet for each peripheral machined hole is controlled in relation to the required heat production, the steam pressure or the roller rotation speed so that the percentage composition of excess steam which emerges with the condensate comes under 20, pref. between 5 and 15 wt.%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/02; D21F 5/10; D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 13/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 5/02 (2013.01); D21F 5/028 (2013.01); D21F 5/10 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01); F28F 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768424 A2 19970416; EP 0768424 A3 19980513; EP 0768424 B1 20000614; CA 2187056 A1 19970414; DE 19538236 A1 19970417; JP H09133125 A 19970520; US 6039681 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-09-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605433 20000720

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB IT SE

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980826

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB IT SE

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970620

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB IT SE