Global Patent Index - EP 0768438 B1

EP 0768438 B1 2000-07-12 - Sheet metal strip for interconnecting building elements

Title (en)

Sheet metal strip for interconnecting building elements

Title (de)

Blechband zum miteinander Verbinden von Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Bande de tôle formant liaison entre éléments de construction

Publication

EP 0768438 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402300 A

Priority

EP 95402300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768438A1] The corrugated sheet steel band (1) forms a connection between a wooden beam (2a) and either a counter beam (2b) or moulded concrete plate. The steel band has crenellated edges (4,5) whose ends (4) have teeth (6) enabling encastring of the band in each beam. The base (5) of each crenellation has a part stopping penetration of the band in the wood constituted from a projecting tooth (7) in the shape of a gouge penetrating into the wood. This tooth has a concave cylindrical wall having one end with a shape similar to a spoon in order to ease penetration into the wood. The two faces of the tooth wall are coated with thermofusible glue which increase the adherence of the wall in the wood after penetration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/292; E04B 5/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2006.01); E04C 3/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E04C 3/292 (2013.01); E04B 2005/237 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768438 A1 19970416; EP 0768438 B1 20000712; AT 194677 T 20000715; DE 69517980 D1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-06-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GAUTHIER DANIEL

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-10-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-10-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517980 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194677 T 20000715

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971013

1997-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT SE

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT SE