Global Patent Index - EP 0768445 B1

EP 0768445 B1 2001-01-10 - Rolling closure device with fixed shaft, counterbalance spring and latching mechanism

Title (en)

Rolling closure device with fixed shaft, counterbalance spring and latching mechanism

Title (de)

Aufrollbare Verschlusseinrichtung mit Festwelle, Federgewichtsausgleich und Verriegelungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture à enroulement à axe fixe, ressort d'équilibrage et dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0768445 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440081 A

Priority

FR 9512069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768445A1] The roller door or grille is designed to roll up round a shaft (1) set horizontally above the doorway when raised. It is equipped with a balancing spring to take the weight of the door/grille. A safety mechanism prevents it from falling in the event of the balancing spring breaking. The safety mechanism is positioned between the shaft and the balancing spring. A spring-loaded catch (60) flies outwards if the balancing spring breaks, engaging with a horizontal member of the door/grille and preventing it from dropping suddenly. The catch is held in its passive position by a retaining peg (63) on a moving hub (53). It is also connected to the hub by a spring (65). In the event of the balancing spring breaking the hub, it is moved by the spring (65), releasing the catch so that it instantly stops the door/grille.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/84; E06B 9/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/174 (2006.01); E06B 9/60 (2006.01); E06B 9/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/174 (2013.01); E06B 9/60 (2013.01); E06B 9/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768445 A1 19970416; EP 0768445 B1 20010110; AT 198635 T 20010115; DE 69611498 D1 20010215; FR 2739656 A1 19970411; FR 2739656 B1 19971121

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TOURNIER GERARD

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010413

2001-04-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-04-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611498 20010215

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL PT

2001-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198635 T 20010115

2000-10-18 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 19970707 0100 G.T.P. SARL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOURNIER, GERARD

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURNIER, GERARD

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOURNIER, GERARD

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLING CLOSURE DEVICE WITH FIXED SHAFT, COUNTERBALANCE SPRING AND LATCHING MECHANISM

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971004

1997-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.T.P. SARL

1997-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOURNIER, GERARD

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL PT