Global Patent Index - EP 0768446 B1

EP 0768446 B1 2000-07-12 - Method and boring tool for drilling into subterranean formations

Title (en)

Method and boring tool for drilling into subterranean formations

Title (de)

Verfahren und Bohrgerät zum Abteufen von Bohrungen in unterirdische Formationen

Title (fr)

Procédé et outil de forage pour le forage de puits dans les formations souterraines

Publication

EP 0768446 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115867 A

Priority

EP 95115867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768446A1] The process for sinking a bore hole through underground formations which include special formations of strata with significantly different formation pressures to those in adjacent formations, comprises drilling a first bore hole using a tool carried on the lower end of a pipe train and driven by a deep-hole motor to a point close to the boundary of the first formation. To extend the hole through the special formation, a tubular housing carrying a driven bore-crown at its lower end is inserted with the drill, and this acts as a liner for the bore hole at least in the region of the special formation. Also claimed is a drilling device for the process, comprising a pipe train (3) and a drilling tool (4) comprising a deep-hole motor and a drill bit (10) enclosed in a tool housing (7) whose upper end can be connected to the lower end (5) of the pipe train (3). The drill bit (10) is attached to a drive shaft (9) extending beyond the end of the tool housing (7). An outer housing (11), whose length exceeds the depth of the special formation, has a bore-crown (20) and a removable connection (12) at its upper end to fix it to the pipe train. The outer housing (11) and the drilling tool are provided with interlocking mechanisms, of which an upper set (14) supports the tool housing (7) at a lowest position inside the outer housing (11), and a lower set (16) connects the drive shaft (9) of the deep-hole motor with a lower, independently rotatable part (17) of the outer housing so that it rotates with the drill bit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768446 A1 19970416; EP 0768446 B1 20000712; DE 59508569 D1 20000817; NO 311046 B1 20011001; NO 964272 A 19970410; NO 964272 D0 19961008; US 5845722 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151008

2015-10-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151008

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508569

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110501

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508569 20000817

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990810

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970709

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL