Global Patent Index - EP 0768465 B1

EP 0768465 B1 2001-12-12 - Gas compressor

Title (en)

Gas compressor

Title (de)

Gasverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à gaz

Publication

EP 0768465 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96307357 A

Priority

JP 28638595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768465A1] A quiet gas compressor from which pulsations leaking to outside are small. A rear side housing side plate 3 is provided with a silencing passage 21 from a first discharge opening 16 to a second discharge opening 20 of an oil separator 11. The silencing passage 21 is made small in passage cross-sectional area and long in passage length within such a limit that the silencing passage 21 does not excessively raise the internal pressure inside a compression chamber 8. The upper surface of the silencing passage 21 is blocked by the oil separator 11. The cross-sectional area S1 of the second discharge opening 20 of the oil separator 11 is made small within such a limit that it does not excessively raise the internal pressure inside the compression chamber 8. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04C 18/344 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/068 (2013.01); F01C 21/10 (2013.01); F04C 29/0035 (2013.01); F04C 18/3446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768465 A1 19970416; EP 0768465 B1 20011212; DE 69617865 D1 20020124; DE 69617865 T2 20020425; JP 2858302 B2 19990217; JP H09105393 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617865 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001128

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR