Global Patent Index - EP 0768494 B1

EP 0768494 B1 2002-12-18 - Electric heating system for home oven

Title (en)

Electric heating system for home oven

Title (de)

Elektrisches Heizungssystem für Haushaltofen

Title (fr)

Système de chauffage électrique pour four ménager

Publication

EP 0768494 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202753 A

Priority

IT MI950693 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768494A2] A description is given of an electric heating system for a home oven, comprising a ceiling electric heating unit and a floor electric heating unit. The ceiling electric heating unit (4) consists of a single comb resistor (12), with wide loops, which occupies the whole cavity of the oven and has the teeth of the comb turned towards the front opening of the oven. The floor heating unit (5) consists of an external resistor (13) which develops rectilinearly along the side walls and the front of the oven and, partially, along the rear wall of the oven itself, and of an internal resistor (14) which extends along a substantially pear-shaped path from the back of the oven up to a front area of the oven itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768494 A2 19970416; EP 0768494 A3 19980923; EP 0768494 B1 20021218; DE 69625438 D1 20030130; DE 69625438 T2 20030605; IT 237210 Y1 20000905; IT MI950693 U1 19970411; IT MI950693 V0 19951011

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69625438

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111002

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625438 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625438 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990312

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT