Global Patent Index - EP 0768497 B1

EP 0768497 B1 2000-01-26 - Support for radiator

Title (en)

Support for radiator

Title (de)

Standkonsole für Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Support de radiateur

Publication

EP 0768497 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115435 A

Priority

  • DE 19537487 A
  • DE 19548255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768497A1] The bracket is used to mount a radiator in an upright position, and has a standing support (2) which can be placed on a foot support (1), and which can be adjusted into a perpendicular alignment. A bracket element to support an upright radiator is arranged on the standing support, and the upper end of the latter has a radiator mounting. The foot support has a baseplate (3) and a holding component (4), which is arranged at right angles to it. The standing support has a detachable connection to the holding component, which allows it to be pivoted through an angle (alpha), and its level can be adjusted. The mounting can be adjusted horizontally using adjusting equipment (33) on the lower end of the standing support. The holding component has a fixing bolt (6) at its lower end directed sideways, which juts through a longitudinal slit in the standing support to clamp them together on fastening of a nut (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0293 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0213 (2013.01); F24D 19/0243 (2013.01); F24D 19/0246 (2013.01); F24D 19/025 (2013.01); F24D 19/0203 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768497 A1 19970416; EP 0768497 B1 20000126; AT 189303 T 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEUEL WILHELM

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-12-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20010401

2001-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010401

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189303

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981106

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970606

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL