Global Patent Index - EP 0768500 A3

EP 0768500 A3 2000-04-05 - Elevation controller for air suction grille

Title (en)

Elevation controller for air suction grille

Title (de)

Liftvorrichtung für ein Absauggitter

Title (fr)

Commande pour l'élévation d'une grille d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0768500 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96116274 A

Priority

  • JP 29207595 A
  • JP 35108595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768500A2] An in-ceiling mount type air conditioner (50) including an operation switch (51) for switching a power supply status of a power source to an elevating motor (140) for elevating an air suction grille (9), upper-limit position detectors (52,53) for detecting the upper-limit and lower-limit positions of the air suction grille (9) respectively, a forced stop detector for detecting the forced stop of the air suction grille, a timer (143) for counting a predetermined time from the actuation of the upper-limit position detector (52), and a controller for stopping the elevating motor (140) when the timer (143) counts the predetermined time after the air suction grille (9) reaches the upper-limit position and keeping the air suction grille (9) to stop when the forced stop of the air suction grille is detected by the forced stop detector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/08; F24F 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 552 (M - 1056) 7 December 1990 (1990-12-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 534 (M - 1486) 27 September 1993 (1993-09-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768500 A2 19970416; EP 0768500 A3 20000405; EP 0768500 B1 20030924; CN 1111686 C 20030618; CN 1161435 A 19971008; CN 1223805 C 20051019; CN 1389674 A 20030108; DE 69630091 D1 20031030; DE 69630091 T2 20040617; ES 2207662 T3 20040601; KR 100430874 B1 20040716; PT 768500 E 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151011

2016-11-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161128

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151010

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69630091

2015-10-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69630091

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091010

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2010-04-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207662 T3

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030405027

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69630091 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021017

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/08 A, 7F 24F 13/28 B

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT