Global Patent Index - EP 0768694 A3

EP 0768694 A3 2000-04-12 - Electromagnetic relay and method for its manufacture

Title (en)

Electromagnetic relay and method for its manufacture

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Relais und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Relais électromagnétique et méthode pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0768694 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96115749 A

Priority

DE 19537613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5889454A] An electromagnetic relay and methods for its manufacture are provided. The relay has a coil body with flanges and with at least one winding disposed between the flanges. A rod-shaped core is respectively arranged axially inside each winding. The yoke is secured against motion in the longitudinal direction and against pivotal movement in a coil flange by mounting elements. In addition, the first end of the core is connected on the side surface of the first yoke leg by welding or soldering. A double relay with first yoke legs disposed next to each other in parallel fashion is preferably created, whereby the core-yoke connection is produced in a simple manner and a good magnetic transition is ensured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/36; H01H 49/00; H01H 50/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01); H01H 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/36 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0087 (2013.01); H01H 2050/049 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5889454 A 19990330; AT 217441 T 20020515; EP 0768694 A2 19970416; EP 0768694 A3 20000412; EP 0768694 B1 20020508; JP 3844817 B2 20061115; JP H09129105 A 19970516

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 217441 T

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-10-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160930

2016-10-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609182

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609182 20020613

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217441 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 50/36 A, 7H 01H 49/00 B, 7H 01H 50/60 B

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI