Global Patent Index - EP 0768695 B1

EP 0768695 B1 2001-12-12 - Contactor for starter with improved fixed contacts, and starter for motor vehicle equipped with such a contactor

Title (en)

Contactor for starter with improved fixed contacts, and starter for motor vehicle equipped with such a contactor

Title (de)

Anlassschalter mit verbesserten Festkontakten, und Anlasser für Motorfahrzeug mit solchem Schalter

Title (fr)

Contacteur de démarreur portant des contacts fixes perfectionnés et démarreur de véhicule automobile équipé d'un tel contacteur

Publication

EP 0768695 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402165 A

Priority

FR 9512076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768695A1] The switch for the starter of the vehicle comprises a mobile contact element (26) made of electrically conducting material, movable between a rest position and an active position in which it establishes connection between two fixed contacts (42). Movement of the mobile contact is achieved by use of a magnetic core moving axially with an electromagnetic core. At least one and preferably both of the main fixed contacts (42) is electrically connected to an auxiliary fixed contact (52). The free end of each auxiliary contact is placed such that the mobile contact element comes into contact with the auxiliary contacts as it moves towards the closed position. The auxiliary contacts are made of a conductive material with non-zero resistance, so that current flow starts to occur before connection of the main contacts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06; H01H 9/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/38 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01); H01H 9/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768695 A1 19970416; EP 0768695 B1 20011212; CN 1077957 C 20020116; CN 1159514 A 19970917; DE 69617867 D1 20020124; DE 69617867 T2 20020620; FR 2739899 A1 19970418; FR 2739899 B1 19971121; US 5801607 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69617867

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617867 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000425

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971016

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT