Global Patent Index - EP 0768731 B1

EP 0768731 B1 2001-12-19 - Connector assembly

Title (en)

Connector assembly

Title (de)

Steckeranordnung

Title (fr)

Assemblage de connecteur

Publication

EP 0768731 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115727 A

Priority

DE 19537725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0768731A2] The connector arrangement has a housing with a chamber for holding an electrical contact. A sliding member (1)is inserted in the housing perpendicular to the connection direction. There is a raised part (2) on the sliding member and an opening on the housing of a mating connector part or test device in which the raised part engages when the sliding member is pushed in. The opening is accessible when the sliding member is not inserted. The opening is closed to a first degree when the sliding member is not fully home and to a second degree when the sliding member is fully home.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/42 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/641 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4361 (2013.01); H01R 13/641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0768731 A2 19970416; EP 0768731 A3 19980211; EP 0768731 B1 20011219; DE 19537725 A1 19970417; JP H09115585 A 19970502

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608489

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-10-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-10-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608489 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980611

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB