Global patent index - EP 0768976 B1

EP 0768976 B1 2000-01-19 - SNAP FASTENER ON A CONTAINER

Title (en)

SNAP FASTENER ON A CONTAINER

Title (de)

SCHNAPPVERSCHLUSSANORDNUNG AN EINEM BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE A DECLIC POUR RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 0768976 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96908986 A

Priority

  • CH 9600140 W
  • CH 123695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9634807A1] The snap fastener has a closure (1, 2) with a retaining bead (2) to secure it to the container aperture which has an outer bead (5). The retaining bead (3) is arranged on an elastically expandable cylindrical wall (2) of the closure (1, 2). For the purposes of fastening on the container aperture, an engagement surface of the retaining bead (3) can be positively engaged with an engagement surface of the outer bead (5). The two engagement surfaces enclose a gap widening towards the outside. Owing to this gap, a higher overpressure can prevail inside the container without its lifting the closure (1, 2) off the container aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9634807 A1 19961107; DE 59604219 D1 20000224; EP 0768976 A1 19970423; EP 0768976 B1 20000119; US 5848717 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status

2001-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CROWN CORK A.G.

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990303

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961213

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI